EP0096039 - APPARATUS FOR ULTRASONIC EXAMINATION OF DEFORMABLE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1984 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE COMMONWEALTH OF AUSTRALIA Care ofDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH Alexander Building Phillip, ACT 2606 / AU | [1983/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSSOFF, George 37 Lower Cliff Avenue Northbridge, NSW 2063 / AU | 02 /
ROBINSON, David Errol 73 The Outlook Bilgolah Plateau, NSW 2107 / AU | [1983/51] | Application number, filing date | 82903294.5 | 15.11.1982 | [1983/51] | WO1982AU00187 | Priority number, date | AU19810001940 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: AU 194081 | [1983/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302053 | Date: | 23.06.1983 | [1983/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096039 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/51] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, G01N29/04 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
A61B8/0825 (EP);
A61B8/4209 (EP);
A61B90/17 (EP);
G01N29/265 (EP);
A61B10/0233 (EP);
A61B17/3403 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1983/51] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLUNTERSUCHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR VERFORMBARE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1983/51] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ULTRASONIC EXAMINATION OF DEFORMABLE OBJECTS | [1983/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'EXAMEN PAR ULTRASONS D'OBJETS DEFORMABLES | [1983/51] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1984/23] | 17.02.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.09.1983 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 16.09.1983 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 16.09.1983 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 16.09.1983 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.12.1983 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4274421 ; | [X]US4248090 ; | [X]US4211949 ; | [X]US3908446 ; | [X]US3585847 ; | [X]US3556081 ; | [X]US3448606 ; | [X]GB1540673 ; | [Y]AU4465379 ; | [Y]AU3912878 ; | [Y]AU3040177 ; | [X]AU2268277 ; | [X]DE1773514 ; | [A]US4130112 ; | [A]DE2314328 |