EP0093138 - IMPROVED CONTINUOUS AMBULATORY PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Juhasz, Laszlo Woodhead 51 Kilmardinny Avenue Bearsden Glasgow G61 3NL Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states Juhasz, Laszlo Woodhead 51 Kilmardinny Avenue Bearsden Glasgow G61 3NL Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1987/15] | For all designated states Juhasz, Laszlo 18 Clovelly Avenue London NW9 / GB | ||
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states University of Strathclyde Royal College, 204 George Street Glasgow G1 1XW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/15] |
Former [1983/45] | 01 /
JUHASZ, Lazslo 51 Kilmardinny Avenue Bearsden, Glasgow / GB | Representative(s) | Wotherspoon, Graham, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/01] | Wotherspoon, Graham, et al FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1987/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1983/45] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 82903330.7 | 05.11.1982 | [1983/45] | WO1982GB00317 | Priority number, date | GB19810033663 | 07.11.1981 Original published format: GB 8133663 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8301572 | Date: | 11.05.1983 | [1983/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093138 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1983 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093138 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28, A61M25/02, A61M1/00 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
A61M39/0247 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (EP,US);
A61M1/282 (EP,US);
A61M1/285 (EP);
A61M25/02 (EP);
A61M2025/024 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1983/45] | A61M1/03, A61M25/02, A61M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/45] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES KONTINUIERLICH TRAGBARES AMBULATORISCHES PERITONEALES DIALYSE-SYSTEM ZUM ANSCHLUSS ÜBER DIE BAUCHHÖHLE | [1983/45] | English: | IMPROVED CONTINUOUS AMBULATORY PERITONEAL DIALYSIS SYSTEM | [1983/45] | French: | SYSTEME CONTINU AMELIORE DE DIALYSE PERITONEALE AMBULATOIRE | [1983/45] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.1983 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 01.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/42] | Request for further processing for: | 08.01.1985 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.1985 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.10.1987 | BE | 28.10.1987 | CH | 28.10.1987 | FR | 28.10.1987 | LI | 28.10.1987 | NL | 28.10.1987 | SE | 31.10.1987 | LU | 30.11.1987 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 28.10.1987 | |
BE | 28.10.1987 | ||
CH | 28.10.1987 | ||
LI | 28.10.1987 | ||
NL | 28.10.1987 | ||
SE | 31.10.1987 | ||
LU | 30.11.1987 | ||
Former [1989/25] | AT | 28.10.1987 | |
BE | 28.10.1987 | ||
CH | 28.10.1987 | ||
LI | 28.10.1987 | ||
NL | 28.10.1987 | ||
SE | 31.10.1987 | ||
Former [1989/21] | AT | 28.10.1987 | |
BE | 28.10.1987 | ||
NL | 28.10.1987 | ||
SE | 31.10.1987 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 28.10.1987 | |
BE | 28.10.1987 | ||
NL | 28.10.1987 | ||
Former [1989/10] | BE | 28.10.1987 | |
NL | 28.10.1987 | ||
Former [1989/03] | BE | 28.10.1987 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3520298 (LANGE KURT); | [Y]US3633585 (MCDONALD HAROLD P JR); | [A]US4015601 (BOKROS JACK C, et al); | [X]DE2809303 (POPOVICH ROBERT P); | [A]FR2390940 (PUJO JEAN MICHEL [FR]); | [A]US4184497 (KESSLER THOMAS R [US], et al); | [A]EP0022370 (AMERICAN HOSPITAL SUPPLY CORP [US]); | [Y]US4256102 (MONACO ANTHONY P) | Examination | US4239041 |