EP0094972 - PHOTOCOUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 16.03.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR RESEARCH FOUNDATION Kawauchi Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states SEMICONDUCTOR RESEARCH FOUNDATION Kawauchi Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Jun-ichi 6-16, Komegafukuro 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Sunderland, James Harry, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | Sunderland, James Harry, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 82903475.0 | 30.11.1982 | [1983/48] | WO1982JP00456 | Priority number, date | JP19810192415 | 30.11.1981 Original published format: JP 19241581 | [1983/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8302039 | Date: | 09.06.1983 | [1983/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094972 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094972 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/12, H01L29/74, H01L29/76, H01L31/10 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
H01L31/12 (EP,US);
H01L31/1126 (EP,US);
H01L31/167 (EP,US);
H01L31/173 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1983/48] | Title | German: | PHOTOKOPPLER | [1983/48] | English: | PHOTOCOUPLER | [1983/48] | French: | PHOTOCOUPLEUR | [1983/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.1983 | Translation filed | 10.08.1983 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.1983 | Search fee paid | 10.08.1983 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.1983 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 07.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.1989
14.04.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.1989
14.04.1989
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 12.04.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.07.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 20.01.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/18] | Appeal following opposition | 01.10.1991 | Appeal received No. T0778/91 | 18.12.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.01.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 20.01.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.01.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5449085 ; | [A]JP5320885 ; | [X]GB1518258 (SILICONIX LTD) | [X] - IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, vol. SC-16, no. 4, August 1981, NEW YORK (US) J.UEDA et al.: "An optically coupled crosspoint array with high dv/dt capability and high gate sensitivity", pages 286-293 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Section E, vol. 3, no. 70, June 16, 1979 & JP - A - 54 49 085 (SHARP K.K.) (18-4-1979), & JP5449085 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Section E, vol. 2, no. 56, April 24, 1978 & JP - A - 53 20 885 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) (25-2-1978), & JP5320885 A 00000000 | [A] - INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, Washington D.C., December 3-5, 1979, IEEE T.OHMI: " Power static induction transistor technology ", pages 84-87 | International search | [X]JPS5449085 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPS5619749B ; | [Y]JPS5320885 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) | [Y] - Toshiba Review, Vol. 28, No. 4, April. 1973 (Kanagawa) Yoshida Mitsuo, Kihara Toshihiko, Ito Masao, Nagasawa Hiroshi, "Photocoupler", p. 411-416 |