EP0084336 - Combined dressing and writing furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/30] | Combined dressing and writing table | ||
[1986/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thöner, Franz Ludwigstrasse 16 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [1983/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/30] | Representative(s) | Holzer, Rupprecht Ludwigstrasse 26 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | Holzer, Rupprecht, Dipl.-Ing. Ludwigstrasse 26 D-8900 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100117.7 | 08.01.1983 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | DE19820000653U | 14.01.1982 Original published format: DE 8200653 U | [1983/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084336 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084336 | Date: | 18.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084336 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47B67/00, A47B83/00 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
A47B83/045 (EP);
A47B67/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, LU [1983/30] | Title | German: | Kombiniertes Schreib- und Toilettemöbel | [1983/30] | English: | Combined dressing and writing furniture | [1986/47] | French: | Secrétaire et coiffeuse combinés | [1983/30] |
Former [1983/30] | Combined dressing and writing table | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 30.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/46] | 11.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR538016 ; | [Y]DE379134 (HORST LIEDTKE); | [Y]US1564796 (SHROYER JACOB L); | [A]US1966800 (HARRIS KATZMAN) |