EP0088863 - Automatic opening mechanism for pivoting or folding doors, especially for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1986 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Austria Metall Aktiengesellschaft A-5282 Braunau am Inn / AT | [1985/39] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states Vereinigte Metallwerke Ranshofen-Berndorf AG A-5282 Braunau am Inn / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gemeinböck, Gerhard Anton Sattlergasse 115/17/7/23 A-1220 Wien / AT | 02 /
Trimmel, Engelbert, Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenstrasse 150/4 A-1050 Wien / AT | [1983/38] | Representative(s) | Hain, Leonhard Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | Hain, Leonhard, Dipl.-Ing. Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100133.4 | 10.01.1983 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | AT19820000229 | 22.01.1982 Original published format: AT 22982 | [1983/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088863 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088863 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/02 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
E05F15/50 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/38] | Title | German: | Automatischer Öffnungsmechanismus für Dreh- oder Falttüren, insbesondere von Fahrzeugen | [1983/38] | English: | Automatic opening mechanism for pivoting or folding doors, especially for vehicles | [1983/38] | French: | Mécanisme d'ouverture automatique pour portes pivotantes ou pliantes, en particulier pour véhicules | [1983/38] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 19.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 31.07.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/05] | 01.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH340248 ; | [Y]DE1083700 ; | [A]DE1915971 ; | [A]FR2384932 |