EP0085843 - Antimycosic agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1986 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holmwood, Graham, Dr. Katernbergerstrasse 184 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 02 /
Regel, Erik Untere Bergerheide 26 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Jäger, Gerhard, Dr. Gellertstrasse 18 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 04 /
Büchel, Karl Heinz, Prof. Dr. Dabringhausener Strasse 42 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | 05 /
Plempel, Manfred, Dr. Zwengenberger Strasse 3c D-5657 Haan / DE | [1983/33] | Application number, filing date | 83100260.5 | 14.01.1983 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | DE19823202602 | 27.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3202602 | [1983/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085843 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085843 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/41, A61K31/415, // C07D249/08, C07D233/60 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP);
A61K31/41 (EP);
A61K31/415 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP);
C07D249/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/33] | Title | German: | Antimykotisches Mittel | [1983/33] | English: | Antimycosic agent | [1983/33] | French: | Moyen antimycosique | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 08.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.01.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0052424 (ICI PLC [GB]); | [A]US4123542 (WALKER KEITH A M); | [A]US4277475 (VICKERY BRIAN H); | [A]EP0043419 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0054974 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) |