EP0085344 - Process for the removal of heavy metal ions from wet process phosphoric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.1987 [1987/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gradl, Reinhard, Dr. Am grünen Weg 6 D-5030 Hürth / DE | 02 /
Schimmel, Günther, Dr. Ehrenstrasse 16 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | 03 /
Krause, Werner, Dr. Alleestrasse 42 D-5030 Hürth / DE | 04 /
Heymer, Gero, Dr. Fasanenaue 12 D-5042 Erftstadt / DE | [1983/32] | Application number, filing date | 83100377.7 | 18.01.1983 | [1983/32] | Priority number, date | DE19823202658 | 28.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3202658 | [1983/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0085344 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0085344 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085344 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C01B25/46, C01B25/237, C22B3/00 | [1983/32] | CPC: |
C01B25/237 (EP,US);
C22B3/24 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Schwermetallionen aus Nassverfahrensphosphorsäure | [1983/32] | English: | Process for the removal of heavy metal ions from wet process phosphoric acid | [1983/32] | French: | Procédé d'élimination d'ions de métaux lourds d'acide phosphorique obtenu par voie humide | [1983/32] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 13.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU791592 ; | [AP]SU912637 ; | [AP]SU975570 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 94, Nr. 22, 1. Juni 1981, Seite 148, Nr. 177487f, Columbus, Ohio, US & SU - A - 791 592 (KAZAKH SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH AND DESIGN INSTITUTE OF THE PHOSPHORUS INDUSTRY) 30.12.1980, & SU791592 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 93, Nr. 18, 3. November 1980, Seite 483, Nr. 175529b, Columbus, Ohio, US | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 97, Nr. 20, 15. November 1982, Seite 148, Nr. 165449u, Columbus, Ohio, US & SU - A - 912 637 (KAZAKH SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH AND DESIGN INSTITUTE OF THE PHOSPHORUS INDUSTRY) 15.03.1982, & SU912637 A 00000000 | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 98, Nr. 16, 18. April 1983, Seite 134, Nr. 128629c, Columbus, Ohio, US & SU - A - 975 570 (KAZAKH SCIENTIFIC-RESEARCH AND DESIGN INSTITUTE OF THE PHOSPHORUS INDUSTRY) 23.11.1982, & SU975570 A 00000000 |