EP0085357 - Heating silica gel in inert atmosphere before activation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/32] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Witt, Donald Reinhold 4909 S.E. Harvard Bartlesville Oklahoma 74003 / US | [1983/32] | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/32] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100434.6 | 19.01.1983 | [1983/32] | Priority number, date | US19820340937 | 20.01.1982 Original published format: US 340937 | [1983/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0085357 | Date: | 10.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0085357 | Date: | 23.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085357 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/22, C08F4/74 | [1983/32] | CPC: |
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J23/26 (EP,US);
B01J37/0018 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/32] | Title | German: | Erwärmung eines Kieselsäuregels in einer inerten Atmosphäre und Aktivierung | [1983/32] | English: | Heating silica gel in inert atmosphere before activation | [1983/32] | French: | Chauffage d'un gel de silice sous atmosphère inerte et activation | [1983/32] | Examination procedure | 02.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP8118610 ; | [Y]GB1447605 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO); | [Y]FR2323706 (BASF AG [DE]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 1, July 1981, page 23, abstract no. 8057f (COLUMBUS, OHIO, US) & JP - A - 81 18 610 (ASAHI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY) 21 February 1981, & JP8118610 A 19810221 |