EP0084868 - Flow advantageous construction of an enclosure for the reduction of the fan and engine noise of an internal-combustion engine with liquid cooling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.A.N. Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Dachauer Strasse 667 Postfach 50 06 20 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [1986/45] |
Former [1983/31] | For all designated states M.A.N. MASCHINENFABRIK AUGSBURG-NÜRNBERG Aktiengesellschaft Dachauer Strasse 667 Postfach 50 06 20 D-8000 München 50 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buddenhagen, Uwe, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Ehrenbreitsteiner Strasse 61 D-8000 München 50 / DE | 02 /
Stiglmaier, Manfred, Ing. grad. Am Grübel 7a D-8031 Gilching / DE | [1983/31] | Application number, filing date | 83100502.0 | 21.01.1983 | [1983/31] | Priority number, date | DE19823202592 | 27.01.1982 Original published format: DE 3202592 | [1983/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0084868 | Date: | 03.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084868 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F01P5/06, F01P11/12, F01P11/10 | [1983/31] | CPC: |
F01P5/06 (EP);
F01P11/10 (EP);
F01P11/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/31] | Title | German: | Strömungsgünstige Konstruktion einer Kapsel für die Dämmung des Lüfter- und Motoren-Geräusches bei Verbrennungsmotoren mit Flüssigkeitskühlung | [1983/31] | English: | Flow advantageous construction of an enclosure for the reduction of the fan and engine noise of an internal-combustion engine with liquid cooling | [1983/31] | French: | Construction à écoulement amélioré d'une enveloppe insonorisant le bruit généré par un moteur à combustion interne avec refroidissement liquide et son ventilateur | [1983/31] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 08.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR464962 (APP RATEAU SOC D EXPL DES [FR]); | [A]GB510937 (BRANDENBURGISCHE MOTORENWERKE); | [A]FR1283147 (COLCHESTER WOODS); | [A]GB1171001 (ROTRON INC [US]); | [Y]FR2170706 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE2506364 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]DE2703227 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [Y]DE2722089 (STEYR DAIMLER PUCH AG); | [A]GB2038938 (FODENS LTD) |