EP0085866 - Derivatives of benzo-1,2-thiazine-1,1-dioxide, a process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1987 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo, 30 43100 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states CHIESI FARMACEUTICI S.p.A. Via Palermo, 30 I-43100 Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chiesi, Paolo Via Palermo 30 I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
Villani, Flavio Via Palermo 30 I-43100 Parma / IT | [1983/33] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti, Giuseppe, et al Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | Bianchetti, Giuseppe, et al Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 83100504.6 | 21.01.1983 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | IT19820019486 | 05.02.1982 Original published format: IT 1948682 | [1983/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085866 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085866 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/12, A61K31/54, // C07D275/06 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
C07D275/06 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/33] | Title | German: | Benzo-1,2-thiazin-1,1-Dioxidderivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und sie enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1983/33] | English: | Derivatives of benzo-1,2-thiazine-1,1-dioxide, a process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing the same | [1983/33] | French: | Dérivés du 1,1-dioxyde de benzo-1,2-thiazine, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 27.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4309427 (LOMBARDINO JOSEPH G) |