EP0085880 - Process for the preparation of ethene-1,2-dicarboxylic acid amide ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1986 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1986 [1986/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/33] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zecher, Wilfried, Dr. Treptower Strasse 6 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Merten, Rudolf, Dr. Berta-von-Suttner-Strasse 55 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1983/33] | Application number, filing date | 83100610.1 | 25.01.1983 | [1983/33] | Priority number, date | DE19823204129 | 06.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3204129 | [1983/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0085880 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0085880 | Date: | 11.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C102/04, C07C103/58, C07C103/64 | [1983/33] | CPC: |
C07C233/09 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Ethen-(1,2)-dicarbonamidsäureestern | [1983/33] | English: | Process for the preparation of ethene-1,2-dicarboxylic acid amide ester | [1983/33] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de l'amide ester de l'acide éthène-1,2-dicarboxylique | [1983/33] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1983 | Examination requested [1983/33] | 17.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2350330 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [X]FR2291999 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]US3228972 (HERBERT SCHWARTZ) | Examination | EP0033477 |