EP0087599 - Diazonium salts and reagents for bilirubin assay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babb, Bruce E. 450 French Road Rochester New York 14618 / US | 02 /
Dappen, Glen M. 1215 Majestic Way Webster New York 14580 / US | [1983/36] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83100873.5 | 31.01.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | US19820344433 | 01.02.1982 Original published format: US 344433 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0087599 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087599 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C113/04, C07C143/86, G01N33/72 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/728 (EP,US);
Y10S436/903 (EP,US);
Y10T436/146666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/36] | Title | German: | Diazoniumsalze und Mittel zum Nachweis von Bilirubin | [1983/36] | English: | Diazonium salts and reagents for bilirubin assay | [1983/36] | French: | Sels de diazonium et agent de diagnostic de la bilirubine | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 10.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 07.05.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0009164 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) | [A] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no 161, September 1977 "Luminescence analysis of bilirubin" pages 16-17 |