EP0086409 - Method and device for the high-precision measuring of the phase position and phase shift of two pulse trains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/34] | Method and device for the high-precision measuring of the phase position and phase shift of two pulse trains | ||
[1983/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungsgesellschaft Druckmaschinen e.V. Lyonerstrasse 18 D-6000 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | For all designated states Forschungsgesellschaft Druckmaschinen e.V. Lyonerstrasse 18 D-6000 Frankfurt / DE | ||
Former [1983/34] | For all designated states Forschungsgesellschaft Druckmaschinen e.V. Lyonerstrasse 18 D-6000 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spiegel, Nikolaus Zeilharder Strasse 14a D-6107 Reinheim / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Rudolf Dieburger Strasse 75 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | 01 /
Spiegel, Nikolaus Zeilharder Strasse 14a D-6107 Reinheim / DE | ||
02 /
Fischer, Rudolf Dieburger Strasse 75 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Stoltenberg, Heinz-Herbert Baldo c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/34] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1983/34] | Stoltenberg, Baldo Heinz-Herbert c/o Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101041.8 | 04.02.1983 | [1983/34] | Priority number, date | DE19823205240 | 15.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3205240 | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | DE19823205240 | 15.02.1982 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0086409 | Date: | 24.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0086409 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01R25/08 | [1983/34] | CPC: |
G01P3/565 (EP,US);
G01R25/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur hochgenauen Messung der Phasenlage bzw. Phasenverschiebung zweier Impulsfolgen | [1983/34] | English: | Method and device for the high-precision measuring of the phase position and phase shift of two pulse trains | [1983/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer avec grande précision la position de phase et le déphasage de deux séries d'impulsions | [1983/34] |
Former [1983/34] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur hochgenauen Messung der Phasenlage bzw. Phasenverschiebung zweier Impulsfolgen | ||
Former [1983/34] | Method and device for the high-precision measuring of the phase position and phase shift of two pulse trains | ||
Former [1983/34] | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer avec grande précision la position de phase et le déphasage de deux séries d'impulsions | Examination procedure | 04.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/34] | 25.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.11.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1986 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | DE1806916 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | US3618073 [ ] (DOMCHICK STEPHEN J, et al); | FR2277346 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | GB1439553 [ ] (SEM SANDBERG S G); | DE2758525 [ ] (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES); | US4181884 [ ] (FUKAYA HIROYASU [JP], et al) |