EP0088240 - Baler for big bales [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1986 [1986/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz AG Zweigniederlassung Fahr D-7702 Gottmadingen / DE | [1983/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schaible, Siegfried, Dipl.-Ing. Breslauerstrasse 15 D-7700 Singen/Htwl. / DE | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | LS-MP von Puttkamer Berngruber Loth Spuhler Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB ALPHA-Haus Garmischer Strasse 35 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Haft, von Puttkamer, Berngruber, Czybulka Patentanwälte Franziskanerstrasse 38 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101066.5 | 04.02.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | DE19823208645 | 10.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3208645 | [1983/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088240 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088240 | Date: | 06.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/00, A01F15/02 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
A01F15/106 (EP,US);
A01D85/002 (EP,US);
A01F15/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/37] | Title | German: | Grossballenpresse | [1983/37] | English: | Baler for big bales | [1983/37] | French: | Presse pour grandes balles | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/39] | 17.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2647472 (HOWARD MACHINERY LTD); | [A]DE2653318 (CLAAS MASCHF GMBH GEB); | [AD]DE2740292 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [AD]DE2740339 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [A]DE1782821 |