EP0087632 - Automatic drain valve for compressed-air systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.1986 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.1986 [1986/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 80710 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE AG Postfach 40 10 60 D-80710 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Knorr-Bremse GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-8000 München 40 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruess, Leopold Trollblumenstrasse 19a D-8000 München 50 / DE | 02 /
Unger, Hans St. Benediktstrasse 7 D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE | [1984/04] |
Former [1983/36] | 01 /
Rueb, Leopold Trollblumenstrasse 19a D-8000 München 50 / DE | ||
02 /
Unger, Hans St. Benediktstrasse 7 D-8044 Unterschleissheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101257.0 | 10.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823207052 | 26.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3207052 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087632 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087632 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087632 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F16T1/14, B60T17/00 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
F16T1/14 (EP);
B60T17/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/36] | Title | German: | Gesteuertes Entwässerungsventil für Druckluftanlagen | [1983/36] | English: | Automatic drain valve for compressed-air systems | [1983/36] | French: | Valve de purge automatique pour installations à air comprimé | [1983/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE7523279U ; | [A]US1520124 (ALBERT GOTTSCHALK) |