EP0087637 - Utility meter reading arrangement, particularly for heating elements and/or hot water meters in homes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCT Neue Communikations-Technik Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Münster Westfalen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states NCT Neue Communikations-Technik Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung Münster Westfalen / DE | ||
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states Remme, Volker Grevener Strasse 112 D-4400 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remme, Volker Grevener Strasse 112 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1988/46] |
Former [1985/51] | 01 /
Remme, Volker Grevener Strasse 112 | ||
Former [1983/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101282.8 | 10.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | DE19823205621 | 17.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3205621 | [1983/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087637 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087637 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087637 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G08C15/04, H04Q9/00 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
G08C15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1983/36] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erfassung von Verbrauchswerten, insbesondere an Heizkörpern und/oder Warmwandzählern in Wohnungen | [1983/36] | English: | Utility meter reading arrangement, particularly for heating elements and/or hot water meters in homes | [1983/36] | French: | Dispositif de lecture de compteurs de consommation, en particulier pour éléments de chauffage et/ou compteurs d'eau chaude dans des habitations | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/07] | 19.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 28.02.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2192422 [ ] (ZETTLER ELEKTROTECHN ALOIS [DE]); | DE2549791 [ ] (HARTMANN & BRAUN AG); | GB1005440 [ ] (BERGWERKSGESELLSCHAFT WALSUM M); | US3737858 [ ] (TURNER L, et al); | WO8102962 [ ] (YONG F) |