EP0087090 - Bed with a tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1984 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1984 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.02.1985 [1985/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esslinger, Hartmut H. Grenzweg 33 D-7272 Altensteig / DE | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101363.6 | 12.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | DE19820004949U | 23.02.1982 Original published format: DE 8204949 U | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087090 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087090 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47C19/22, A47C21/00 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
A47C19/22 (EP);
A47C21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Bett mit Ablageplatte | [1983/35] | English: | Bed with a tray | [1983/35] | French: | Lit avec plaque de support | [1983/35] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 06.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/46] | 27.11.1984 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2904798 ; | [Y]BE836062 ; | [A]EP0018613 ; | [A]DE2433882 |