EP0087106 - Handling apparatus for making boxes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1988 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.06.1988 [1988/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states V M E I "LENIN" Quartal Darvenitza BG-1156 Sofia / BG | [1983/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dautov, Dimitar Angelov, Dipl.-Ing. Kokitsche-Strasse 1 Kostenez / BG | 02 /
Konstantinov, Michail Sotirov Dipl.-Ing. 1ste Strasse Nr. 5 Losen / BG | [1983/35] | Representative(s) | Finck, Dieter, et al V. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Mariahilfplatz 2-3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | Finck, Dieter, et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 - 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101439.4 | 15.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | BG19820055394 | 15.02.1982 Original published format: BG 5539482 | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087106 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087106 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087106 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B31B3/60 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP);
B31B50/042 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (EP);
B31B2100/0022 (EP);
B31B2120/30 (EP);
B31B50/062 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1983/35] | B31B3/36 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/35] | Title | German: | Manipulator zur Herstellung von Schachteln | [1983/35] | English: | Handling apparatus for making boxes | [1983/35] | French: | Appareil de manutention pour la fabrication de boîtes | [1983/35] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 01.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1187864 ; | [A]US3371585 (MOSER HENRY W, et al); | [A]US1365921 (JOSLIN FRANK M); | [A]DE888200 (LOEWENBRAEU MUENCHEN); | [A]US2379920 (PETERS JOHN F); | [A]US1346899 ; | [A]US2584855 (FERGNANI WALTER P); | [A]DE171649 ; | [A]US2841270 (LA BOMBARD LEON E); | [A]US4012996 (STOLKIN WALTER J, et al); | [A]FR2338136 (NITEDALS TAENDSTIKFABRIK AS [NO]) |