EP0089496 - Galvanic cell construction and method for its assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC. Checkerboard Square St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states EVEREADY BATTERY COMPANY, INC. Checkerboard Square St. Louis Missouri 63164 / US | ||
Former [1983/39] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tucholski, Gary Ronald 6317 Delrose Drive Parma Heights, OH 44130 / US | [1983/39] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/39] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing Weiss Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 D-65036 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101632.4 | 19.02.1983 | [1983/39] | Priority number, date | US19820359775 | 19.03.1982 Original published format: US 359775 | [1983/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0089496 | Date: | 28.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0089496 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/04, H01M6/12 | [1983/39] | CPC: |
H01M6/12 (EP,US);
H01M50/167 (EP,US);
H01M50/171 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [1988/11] |
Former [1983/39] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI | Title | German: | Konstruktion einer galvanischen Zelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1983/39] | English: | Galvanic cell construction and method for its assembly | [1983/39] | French: | Construction de pile galvanique et méthode d'assemblage | [1983/39] | File destroyed: | 18.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/52] | 24.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP5740859 ; | [A]JP55150551 ; | [A]US3901732 (KALNOKI KIS TIBOR, et al); | [A]US3990918 (BRO PER, et al); | [XP]EP0053830 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP]); | [XP]EP0064402 (RAY O VAC INT CORP [US]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 111 (E-114)(989), June 22, 1982 & JP - A - 57 40859 (DAINI SEIKOSHA K.K.) 06.03.1982, & JP5740859 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 23 (E-45)(695), February 12, 1981 & JP - A - 55 150551 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) 22.11.1980, & JP55150551 A 00000000 |