EP0093241 - Self-cross-linking thermosetting binder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.11.1987 [1987/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Lacke + Farben AG Glasuritstrasse 1 48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states BASF Lacke + Farben AG Glasuritstrasse 1 D-48165 Münster-Hiltrup / DE | ||
Former [1986/23] | For all designated states BASF Lacke + Farben Aktiengesellschaft Max-Winkelmann-Strasse 80 D-4400 Münster / DE | ||
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states BASF Farben + Fasern Aktiengesellschaft Am Neumarkt 30 D-2000 Hamburg 70 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geist, Michael, Dipl.-Chem. Dr. Rubensstrasse 251 D-4400 Münster / DE | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Postfach 34 29 48019 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 34 29 D-48019 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101645.6 | 21.02.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | DE19823215891 | 29.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3215891 | [1983/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093241 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093241 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/44, C09D3/58, C09D3/72, C25D13/06 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
C08G59/58 (EP,US);
C08G18/0814 (EP,US);
C08G59/4284 (EP,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
C09D5/4446 (EP,US);
C09D5/4465 (EP,US);
C09D5/4488 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/45] | C09D5/40, C09D3/58, C09D3/72, C25D13/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/45] | Title | German: | Selbstvernetzendes, hitzehärtbares Bindemittel | [1983/45] | English: | Self-cross-linking thermosetting binder | [1983/45] | French: | Liant auto-réticulant, thermodurcissable | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/06] | 11.05.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1546848 [ ] (BASF AG) |