EP0087151 - Process for producing layers of refractory metals or metallic compounds by chemical vapour deposition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wieczorek, Claudia, Ing. grad. Ostpreussenstrasse 2 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | [1983/35] | Application number, filing date | 83101649.8 | 21.02.1983 | [1983/35] | Priority number, date | DE19823206421 | 23.02.1982 Original published format: DE 3206421 | [1983/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087151 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087151 | Date: | 25.07.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C23C11/00 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
C23C16/507 (EP);
H05K3/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Schichten aus hochschmelzenden Metallen bzw. Metallverbindungen durch Abscheidung aus der Dampfphase | [1983/35] | English: | Process for producing layers of refractory metals or metallic compounds by chemical vapour deposition | [1983/35] | French: | Procédé de production de couches de métaux réfractaires ou de composés métalliques par dépot chimique à partir de la phase vapeur | [1983/35] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 26.03.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/45] | 28.05.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1985/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2312774 ; | [A]US3329601 ; | [A]EP0036780 ; | [A]EP0032788 ; | [A]US3668095 ; | [P]JPS5773175 ; | [A]JPS5521515 | [P] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 154(C-119)(1032)14. August 1982 & JP - A - 57 73175 (KOBE SEIKOSHO K.K.) 07.05.1982 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 50(C-7)(532), 1980Seite 36C7 & JP - A - 55 21515 (OUYOU KAGAKU KENKYUSHO) 15.02.1980 | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, Band 19, Suppl. 19-2, 1980, Seiten 49-53, TokyoJP. |