EP0088379 - Automotive air conditioning system controlled by damped pressure switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1987 [1987/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Singer Company 8 Stamford Forum Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states The Singer Company 8 Stamford Forum Stamford Connecticut 06904 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Orth, Charles D. 79 So. Maywood Road Lake Forest Illinois 60045 / US | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102091.2 | 03.03.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | US19820355628 | 08.03.1982 Original published format: US 355628 | [1983/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088379 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088379 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H35/30 | [1983/37] | CPC: |
H01H35/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/37] | Title | German: | Durch einen gedämpften Druckschalter gesteuertes Klimaanlagensystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1986/31] | English: | Automotive air conditioning system controlled by damped pressure switch | [1983/37] | French: | Système de climatisation d'automobile commandé par un interrupteur à pression amorti | [1986/31] |
Former [1983/37] | Durch einen gedämpften Druckschalter gesteuertes Klimaanlagensystem mit eigenem Antrieb | ||
Former [1983/37] | Système de climatisation automoteur commandé par un interrupteur à pression amorti | File destroyed: | 18.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/20] | 26.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3535480 ; | [Y]CH471458 ; | [A]US2919321 ; | [A]US2412095 (MUERLE RICHARD W) |