EP0088963 - Process for the preparation of pyrazoles by catalytic dehydrogenation of pyrazolines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.1986 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/38] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goetz, Norbert, Dr. Schoefferstrasse 25 D-6520 Worms / DE | 02 /
Rohr, Wolfgang, Dr. In der Dreispitz 13 D-6706 Wachenheim / DE | 03 /
Mangold, Dietrich, Dr. Hermann-Walker-Strasse 49 D-6903 Neckargemuend / DE | 04 /
Hupfer, Leopold, Dr. Waltershoehe 3 D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE | 05 /
Dockner, Toni, Dr. Grossgasse 6 D-6701 Meckenheim / DE | 06 /
Kempe, Uwe, Dr. Danziger Strasse 9 D-6701 Dannstadt-Schauernheim / DE | [1983/38] | Application number, filing date | 83102129.0 | 04.03.1983 | [1983/38] | Priority number, date | DE19823209148 | 13.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3209148 | [1983/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0088963 | Date: | 21.09.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/12 | [1983/38] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pyrazolen durch katalytische Dehydrierung von Pyrazolinen | [1983/38] | English: | Process for the preparation of pyrazoles by catalytic dehydrogenation of pyrazolines | [1983/38] | French: | Procédé de préparation de pyrazoles par déshydrogénation catalytique de pyrazolines | [1983/38] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1983 | Examination requested [1983/50] | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1986 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1986/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3952010 |