EP0090967 - Chassis for optical instruments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.05.1989 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1989 | Opposition rejected | published on 21.06.1989 [1989/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Zeiss D-7920 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | [1983/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mächler, Meinrad Sulzgasse 2 D-7090 Ellwangen / DE | [1983/41] | Application number, filing date | 83102569.7 | 16.03.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | DE19823211868 | 31.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3211868 | [1983/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090967 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090967 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/00, G02B23/16, G02B7/18 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
G01J3/02 (EP,US);
G01J3/0262 (EP,US);
G01J3/0286 (EP,US);
G02B7/008 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/41] | Title | German: | Chassis für optische Geräte | [1983/41] | English: | Chassis for optical instruments | [1983/41] | French: | Châssis pour instruments optiques | [1983/41] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/21] | 28.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.11.1987
13.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE Wild Leitz GmbH, Wetzlar -Konzernstelle Patente + Marken Postfach 20 20 Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 20 D-6330 Wetzlar 1 / DE | [1988/01] | 14.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.05.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.05.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 18.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 25.11.1988 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 05.12.1988 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1989/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2155269 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE2155270 (PHILIPS NV) | Examination | - Prospekt "Aluminiumoxid-Keramik Stemalox" der Rosenthal Technik AG Werksgruppe III, Seite 15. |