EP0090313 - Vibration suppression system for diesel engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1987 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/05] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR COMPANY, LIMITED 2, Takra-cho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Akira No. 5-759-103, Numama Zushi City / JP | 02 /
Abe, Toshiro No. 3-34-9-204, Mutsuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama City / JP | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102788.3 | 21.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | JP19820048388 | 26.03.1982 Original published format: JP 4838882 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0090313 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090313 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/02, F02D35/02, F02M31/12 | [1983/40] | CPC: |
F02M31/042 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/1497 (EP,US);
F02D9/02 (EP,US);
F02M31/12 (EP,US);
F02B3/06 (EP,US);
F02D2009/023 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0232 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0244 (EP,US);
F02D2009/0249 (EP,US);
F02D35/02 (EP,US);
F02D9/1055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/40] | Title | German: | Schwingungsunterdrückungsanlage eines Dieselmotors | [1983/40] | English: | Vibration suppression system for diesel engine | [1983/40] | French: | Système de suppression des vibrations pour moteur diesel | [1983/40] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 06.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.02.1987 | [2002/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU450459 ; | [A]US3157167 (BROOKS WALKER, et al); | [A]FR2323889 (BROCHOT DANIEL [FR]); | [A]US4043304 (STUMPP GERHARD, et al); | [A]GB2054739 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AP]DE3138243 (KANESAKA TECH INST [JP]); | [AP]US4354464 (FUJITA TERUHIRO) | Examination | CH457035 | US4058101 | JPS5676158U | JPS5683535 | JPS56101032 |