EP0098920 - Apparatus for the determination of motor vehicle wheel alignment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1985 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wegmann & Co. GmbH August-Bode-Strasse 1 D-34127 Kassel / DE | [1984/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrammen, Peter, Dr. Korbacher Strasse 247 D-3500 Kassel / DE | 02 /
Schürg, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Baunsbergstrasse 8 D-3501 Fuldabrück / DE | 03 /
Wagner, Johann, Dr.-Ing. Händelstrasse 29 D-3502 Vellmar / DE | [1984/04] | Representative(s) | Feder, Heinrich, et al Dominikanerstrasse 37 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/04] | Feder, Heinz, Dr., et al Dominikanerstrasse 37 D-40545 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102817.0 | 22.03.1983 | [1984/04] | Priority number, date | DE19823225899 | 10.07.1982 Original published format: DE 3225899 | [1984/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0098920 | Date: | 25.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/315, G01S15/88 | [1984/04] | CPC: |
G01B7/315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/04] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vermessung der Radebenen von Kraftfahrzeugen | [1984/04] | English: | Apparatus for the determination of motor vehicle wheel alignment | [1984/04] | French: | Instrument de mesure des caractéristiques d'alignement des roues de véhicules | [1984/04] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 15.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1985 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1985/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2358313 ; | [A]DE2236693 ; | [A]US4099333 |