EP0092692 - Hinge structure, particularly for automobile vehicle doors, incorporating an open position holdback device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEAR S.n.c. di FOGGINI & C. Strada del Bottone, 20 I-10043 Orbassano (Province of Torino) / IT | [1983/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Foggini, Giovanni Corso Matteotti 23 I-10121 Torino / IT | [1983/44] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 83103213.1 | 31.03.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | IT19820067529 | 22.04.1982 Original published format: IT 6752982 | [1983/44] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0092692 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0092692 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/10 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
E05D11/1071 (EP);
E05D11/1057 (EP);
E05D11/1085 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/44] | Title | German: | Scharnier insbesondere für Kraftfahrzeugtüren mit eingebauter Offenhaltungsvorrichtung | [1983/44] | English: | Hinge structure, particularly for automobile vehicle doors, incorporating an open position holdback device | [1983/44] | French: | Charnière, en particulier pour portes de véhicules automobiles, dans laquelle est incorporé un dispositif de maintien en position ouverte | [1983/44] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/13] | 29.10.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1986/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.07.1985 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1985 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2388021 (THOMAS JOHN J); | [A]US2962751 (DOZOIS JAMES H, et al); | [X]FR2283289 (SCHARWAECHTER KG [DE]); | [Y]FR2324841 (RENAULT [FR]) |