EP0091113 - Air lifted and propelled vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.11.1987 [1987/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Antigravity Co., Inc. 98 Cutter Mill Road Great Neck New York / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | For all designated states American Antigravity Co., Inc. 98 Cutter Mill Road Great Neck New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Thomas E. 12-B-1 Hobart Drive Newark Delaware / US | 02 /
Johnson, Raynor A. 709 Brook Drive Newark Delaware / US | [1983/41] | Representative(s) | Weitzel, Wolfgang Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/41] | Weitzel, Wolfgang, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt Friedenstrasse 10 D-89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103284.2 | 02.04.1983 | [1983/41] | Priority number, date | US19820365520 | 05.04.1982 Original published format: US 365520 | [1983/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0091113 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0091113 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60V1/04, B60V1/14 | [1983/41] | CPC: |
B60V1/14 (EP);
B60V1/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/41] | Title | German: | Durch Luft angehobenes angetriebenes Fahrzeug | [1983/41] | English: | Air lifted and propelled vehicle | [1983/41] | French: | Véhicule soutenu et propulsé par air | [1983/41] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/17] | 04.04.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.06.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1306687 ; | [YD]US4155421 ; | [A]US3687217 ; | [AD]US3429395 ; | [A]FR2427480 ; | [A]US4111277 | Examination | US3827527 | US3416626 |