EP0092700 - Process for producing highly resilient cold-curing polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states Th. Goldschmidt AG Goldschmidtstrasse 100 D-45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kollmeier, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Barkhorstrücken 27 D-4300 Essen / DE | 02 /
Klietsch, Bernd-Jürgen Schweidnitzerstrasse 15 D-4660 Gelsenkirchen-Buer / DE | 03 /
Lammerting, Helmut Schweerstrasse 13 D-5812 Herbede / DE | 04 /
Langenhagen, Rolf-Dieter Kampstrasse 5 D-4321 Hattingen-Niederwenigern / DE | [1983/44] | Application number, filing date | 83103339.4 | 06.04.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | DE19823215317 | 23.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3215317 | [1983/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092700 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092700 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/61, C08G18/14, C08K5/54, C08G77/04 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C08J2483/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung hochelastischer kalthärtender Polyurethanschaumstoffe | [1983/44] | English: | Process for producing highly resilient cold-curing polyurethane foams | [1983/44] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de mousses de polyuréthane à grande élasticité, durcissables à froid | [1983/44] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 28.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4014825 [ ] (KANNER BERNARD); | EP0035080 [ ] (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]); | US4031044 [ ] (JOSLYN WALLACE G); | US3966650 [ ] (PROKAI BELA) | Examination | DE2402690 |