EP0093279 - Metallised polymer granulates, manufacture and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1989 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1989 [1989/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sirinyan, Kirkor, Dr. Bamberger Strasse 16 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Merten, Rudolf, Dr. Berta-von-Suttner-Strasse 55 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1983/45] | Application number, filing date | 83103474.9 | 11.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | DE19823215413 | 24.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3215413 | [1983/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093279 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093279 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093279 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0093279 | Date: | 21.04.1988 | [1988/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08F8/42, C08J7/12 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
C08F8/42 (EP,US);
Y10S428/936 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2998 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1983/45] | Title | German: | Metallisierte Polymergranulate, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [1983/45] | English: | Metallised polymer granulates, manufacture and use thereof | [1983/45] | French: | Granulés métallisés polymères, leur fabrication et utilisation | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 11.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/45] | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB765284 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [A]US3281403 (MANUEL THOMAS A, et al); | [A]FR2302319 (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT [GB]); | [A]DE1958639 (UNITIKA LTD, et al) |