EP0101786 - Use of a benzoisothiazoline derivative for the manufacture of a medicament against thrombosis and platelet aggregation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/10] | Pharmaceutical agent containing benzisothiazolones | ||
[1987/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.01.1988 [1988/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi-1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | For all designated states GREEN CROSS CORPORATION 15-1, Imabashi-1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoyama, Kazumasa No. 7, Terauchi 2-chome Toyonaka-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Masahiro No. 570-22, Ookuradani Shimizu Akashi-shi Hyogo / JP | 03 /
Takanabe, Atsuyuki No. 20-18, Nagaodai 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Suyama, Tadakazu No. 3-7, Matsuigaoka 4-chome Tanabe-cho Tsuzuki-gun Kyoto / JP | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103522.5 | 12.04.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | JP19820061489 | 12.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6148982 | [1984/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0101786 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0101786 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/425, C07D275/04 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D275/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, NL, SE [1984/10] | Title | German: | Verwendung von einem Benzoisothiazolinderivat zur Herstellung von einem Medikament gegen Thrombose und Plättchenaggregation | [1987/06] | English: | Use of a benzoisothiazoline derivative for the manufacture of a medicament against thrombosis and platelet aggregation | [1987/06] | French: | Utilisation d'un dérivé de benzoisothiazoline pour la préparation d'un médicament contre la thrombose et l'aggrégation des plaquettes | [1987/06] |
Former [1984/10] | Benzisothiazolone enthaltendes pharmazeutisches Mittel | ||
Former [1984/10] | Pharmaceutical agent containing benzisothiazolones | ||
Former [1984/10] | Agent pharmaceutique contenant des benzisothiazolones | File destroyed: | 25.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/28] | 04.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP57108017 ; | [A]US3300378 (RUDOLF FISCHER); | [A]DE2753391 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]EP0000254 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD [GB]); | [A]GB1495909 (PREPHAR); | [AD]GB848130 (ICI LTD) | [AP] - Patent Abstracts of Japan vol. 6, no. 197, 6 October 1982 & JP-A-57 108017 (Cat. P), & JP57108017 A 19821006 |