EP0092147 - Transport vehicle for a slag receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIRUNA TRUCK AB P.O. Box 99 S-981 01 Kiruna / SE | [1983/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niva, Karl-Erik Virvelvägen 19 S-981 44 Kiruna / SE | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Asketorp, Göran, et al C/o Anoto AB, Scheelevägen 19C 223070 Lund / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Asketorp, Göran P., et al Lars Holmqvist Patentbyra AB Box 4289 S-203 14 Malmö 4 / SE | Application number, filing date | 83103539.9 | 12.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | SE19820002397 | 16.04.1982 Original published format: SE 8202397 | [1983/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092147 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092147 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/48 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
B60P1/483 (EP,US);
B22D41/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug für den Transport von Schlackenpfanne | [1983/43] | English: | Transport vehicle for a slag receptacle | [1983/43] | French: | Véhicule pour le transport d'une poche à laitier | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 23.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.1987
25.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE KAMAG Transporttechnik GmbH + Co. Daimlerstrasse 18 D-7900 Ulm/Donau / DE Opponent's representative Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich Hoffmann - Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.04.1987
25.01.1988
ADMISSIBLE KAMAG Transporttechnik GmbH + Co. Daimlerstrasse 18 D-7900 Ulm/Donau / DE Opponent's representative Kohlmann, Karl Friedrich, Dipl.-Ing. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | 26.01.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.05.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.05.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 27.07.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 11.12.1988 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.1986 | NL | 30.07.1986 | LU | 30.04.1987 | GB | 12.04.1988 | [2015/21] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 30.07.1986 | |
CH | 30.07.1986 | ||
LI | 30.07.1986 | ||
NL | 30.07.1986 | ||
LU | 30.04.1987 | ||
GB | 12.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/32] | AT | 30.07.1986 | |
CH | 30.07.1986 | ||
LI | 30.07.1986 | ||
NL | 30.07.1986 | ||
GB | 12.04.1988 | ||
Former [1989/22] | AT | 30.07.1986 | |
CH | 30.07.1986 | ||
LI | 30.07.1986 | ||
NL | 30.07.1986 | ||
Former [1988/34] | AT | 30.07.1986 | |
NL | 30.07.1986 | ||
Former [1987/22] | AT | 30.07.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1572737 ; | [A]US3499561 (BECKWITH WALTER C); | [A]FR2078491 (HAEGGLUND & SOENER AB, et al); | [A]DE2905299 (SCHMIDT FRITZ); | [A]FR2456003 (SAGE JACQUES) |