EP0096192 - Method and apparatus for the wet treatment of endless textile materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1986 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thies GmbH & Co. Borkener Strasse 155 D-4420 Coesfeld / DE | [1983/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckrodt, Günter, Dipl.-Ing. Am Honigbach 6a D-4420 Coesfeld / DE | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Meyer-Roxlau, Reiner Ferdinand, et al Patentanwalt Rottenbucher Strasse 50 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | Meyer-Roxlau, Reiner Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Rottenbucher Strasse 50 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103633.0 | 14.04.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | DE19823220990 | 03.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3220990 | [1983/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096192 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096192 | Date: | 15.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/03] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0096192 | Date: | 07.04.1986 | [1986/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | D06B3/26 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
D06B3/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Nassbehandlung von endlosem Textilgut | [1983/51] | English: | Method and apparatus for the wet treatment of endless textile materials | [1983/51] | French: | Procédé et installation de traitement à l'eau de matières textiles sans fin | [1983/51] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 18.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.07.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.1986 | BE | 30.04.1986 | CH | 30.04.1986 | LI | 30.04.1986 | LU | 30.04.1986 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/51] | AT | 14.04.1986 | |
BE | 30.04.1986 | ||
CH | 30.04.1986 | ||
LI | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1989/22] | AT | 14.04.1986 | |
CH | 30.04.1986 | ||
LI | 30.04.1986 | ||
Former [1989/12] | AT | 14.04.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2021131 (TANAKA IRON WORKS CO LTD, et al); | [X]DE2015787 ; | [A]FR2119149 (GUERRA LINO); | [A]FR2315564 (BARRIQUAND FRERES [FR]); | [X]DE2935114 (THIES GMBH & CO); | [X]GB2074620 (DORNIER GMBH LINDAUER) |