EP0092238 - Foldable door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EFAFLEX Transport- und Lagertechnik GmbH Fliederstrasse 14 84079 Bruckberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states EFAFLEX Transport- und Lagertechnik GmbH Fliederstrasse 14 D-84079 Bruckberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rejc, Gabriel, Dipl.-Ing. Mainburgerstrasse 28 D-8052 Moosburg / DE | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Grams, Klaus Dieter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Grams, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103785.8 | 19.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | DE19820011456U | 21.04.1982 Original published format: DE 8211456 U | [1983/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092238 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092238 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/48, E05D15/26 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
E06B3/481 (EP,US);
E06B3/805 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/43] | E06B3/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Falttor | [1983/43] | English: | Foldable door | [1983/43] | French: | Porte repliable | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/13] | 23.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.01.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7228820U ; | [A]DE2829912 (KEYERLEBER WALTER KG); | [A]DE8123087U ; | [XP]DE8211456U |