EP0093314 - Switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kautt & Bux KG Industriestrasse 25 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | [1983/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Häne, Edgar Wagenburgstrasse 97 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 02 /
Gross, Paul Lailbergstrasse 17 D-7251 Heimsheim / DE | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | Bartels und Partner, Patentanwälte Lange Strasse 51 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | Patentanwälte Bartels, Held und Partner Lange Strasse 51 D-70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103789.0 | 20.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | DE19823214870 | 22.04.1982 Original published format: DE 3214870 | [1983/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0093314 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093314 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/20, H01H13/08 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
H01H13/08 (EP);
H01H13/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | GB, IT, NL [1983/45] | Title | German: | Schalter | [1983/45] | English: | Switch | [1983/45] | French: | Commutateur | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/26] | 05.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3007304 ; | [A]DE2629446 |