EP0092240 - Radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Satoshi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kenji c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103790.8 | 19.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | JP19820065609 | 20.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6560982 | [1983/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092240 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092240 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP,US);
C09K11/7733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1983/43] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsschirm für Strahlenbild | [1983/43] | English: | Radiation image storage panel | [1983/43] | French: | Ecran d'enregistrement d'image par rayonnement | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1984 | Examination requested [1984/25] | 05.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 31.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP7700786 ; | [A]FR2351436 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) | [X] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 165, January 1978, page 17, ref. 16530 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, no. 18, 2nd May 1977, page 745, no. 132243s, Columbus, Ohio, USA & JP - A - 77 00786 (DAINIPPON TORYO CO., LTD.) 06-01-1977, & JP7700786 A 00000000 |