EP0092819 - Filter medium and process for preparing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1988 [1988/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Masaaki 8-19-430, Shinchujo-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Fukumori, Kunihiko 25-3, Kosobe-cho 1-chome Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP | [1983/44] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/44] | Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103962.3 | 22.04.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | JP19820068812 | 26.04.1982 Original published format: JP 6881282 | JP19820118635 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: JP 11863582 | JP19820118636 | 09.07.1982 Original published format: JP 11863682 | [1983/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0092819 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0092819 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092819 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/16, G21F9/02, D04H3/10, // G21F9/02 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
D04H1/492 (EP,US);
D04H3/10 (EP,US);
G21F9/02 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0457 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0622 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1983/44] | B01D39/16, // G21F9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/44] | Title | German: | Filtermedium und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1983/44] | English: | Filter medium and process for preparing same | [1983/44] | French: | Matière filtrante et procédé de fabrication | [1983/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/44] | 24.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH431460 (DIAPORIT S A [CH]); | [A]DE1486799 (AMERICAN FELT CO); | [A]DE1919816 ; | [A]DE1635593 ; | [A]DE2503615 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG); | [A]DE1760431 ; | [A]DE2655296 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH); | [A]DE2655310 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH); | [A]EP0022182 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0043555 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) |