EP0092260 - A composition of restorative material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawahara, Haruyuki 28, Toko-cho 1-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu 570 / JP | 02 /
Makita, Teruo 20-01, Senriyama Takezono 2-chome Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Kudo, Shozo 1352, Ohaza-aomdani Minoo-shi Osaka-fu 562 / JP | 04 /
Funakoshi, Takashi 12-21, Tomobuchi-cho 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka 534 / JP | [1986/16] |
Former [1984/02] | 01 /
Kawahara, Haruyuki 28, Toko-cho 1-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu 570 / JP | ||
02 /
Makita, Teruo 20-01, Senriyama Takezono 2-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 658 / JP | |||
03 /
Kudo, Shozo 1352, Ohaza-aomdani Minoo-shi Osaka-fu 562 / JP | |||
04 /
Funakoshi, Takashi 12-21, Tomobuchi-cho 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka 534 / JP | |||
Former [1983/43] | 01 /
Kawahara, Haruyuki 28, Toko-cho 1-chome Moriguchi-shi Osaka-fu 570 / JP | ||
02 /
Makita, Teruo 1-57, Fukaeminami-machi, 1-chome Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken 658 / JP | |||
03 /
Kudo, Shozo 1352, Ohaza-aomdani Minoo-shi Osaka-fu 562 / JP | |||
04 /
Funakoshi, Takashi 12-21, Tomobuchi-cho 2-chome Miyakojima-ku Osaka 534 / JP | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83103965.6 | 11.04.1980 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | JP19790044752 | 11.04.1979 Original published format: JP 4475279 | JP19790044753 | 11.04.1979 Original published format: JP 4475379 | [1983/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0092260 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092260 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08, C07C69/52 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
A61L27/446 (EP,US);
A61K6/71 (EP,US);
A61K6/76 (EP,US);
A61K6/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/831 (EP,US);
A61K6/838 (EP,US);
A61L24/0089 (EP,US);
A61L27/16 (EP,US);
A61L27/44 (EP,US);
A61L2430/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/887, C08L33/068 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/10 (US,EP);
A61K6/887, C08L33/14 (EP,US);
A61K6/887, C08L43/04 (US,EP);
A61K6/896, C08L83/04 (EP,US);
A61L27/16, C08L33/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [1983/43] | A61K6/08, A61F1/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1983/43] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung von Restaurationsmaterial | [1983/43] | English: | A composition of restorative material | [1983/43] | French: | Composition de matériau pour la restauration | [1983/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 17.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80101964.7 / EP0017936 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3991008 (TEMIN SAMUEL C, et al); | [Y]US3632677 (PETNER EUGENE J, et al); | [Y]US3930076 (KLIMENT KAREL); | [Y]GB1356445 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK); | [Y]GB1463948 (SULZER AG); | [Y]US3261800 (COLLINS III OLIVER DALE); | [A]FR2400354 (FRIEDRICHSFELD GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB1446709 (NAT PATENT DEV CORP) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 20, 15th May 1978, pages 334,335, no. 141644s, Columbus, Ohio, USA |