EP0093404 - Process for preparing tetrafluoroethylene/fluoro(alkyl vinyl ether) copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Kogyo Co., Ltd. Shinhankyu Building No 1-12-39, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/45] | For all designated states Daikin Kogyo Co., Ltd. Shinhankyu Building No 1-12-39, Umeda Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Shinichi 9-4, Shikanodai Kita 2-chome Ikoma-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Nakagawa, Tsuneo 10-11, Yamatedai 5-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Yamaguchi, Sadaatsu 29-2-617, Yamada-Minami Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Ihara, Kiyohiko 4-8-9, Katayama-cho Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Amano, Toshihiko 15-3, Kitasumoto Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 06 /
Omori, Mitsugu 21-21, Hitotsuya 2-chome Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 07 /
Asano, Kohzoh 5-13, Kita-Kasugaoka 4-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1983/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1983/45] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104138.9 | 28.04.1983 | [1983/45] | Priority number, date | JP19820073671 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: JP 7367182 | [1983/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093404 | Date: | 09.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093404 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0093404 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/26 | [1983/45] | CPC: |
C08F214/262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1983/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vorbereitung eines Tetrafluoroethylen/Fluoro(alkylvinylether) Copolymers | [1983/45] | English: | Process for preparing tetrafluoroethylene/fluoro(alkyl vinyl ether) copolymer | [1983/45] | French: | Procédé pour préparer un copolymère de tétrafluoroéthylène/fluoro(alkylvinyléther) | [1983/45] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/43] | 22.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 17.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2052495 (DU PONT); | [A]DE2104077 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]FR2388012 (DU PONT [US]); | [AD]DE2019150 (DU PONT); | [AD]DE1806097 (DU PONT) |