EP0095584 - Substituted 4-phenoxy and 4-phenylthio prolines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1987 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.1987 [1987/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E.R. Squibb & Sons, Inc. Lawrenceville-Princeton Road Princeton, N.J. 08540-4000 / US | [1983/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haugwitz, Rudiger D. 16 River Road Titusville, NJ / US | 02 /
Sprague, Peter W. 23 Timberlane Drive Pennington, NJ / US | [1987/02] |
Former [1983/49] | 01 /
Haugwitz, Rudiger D. 16 River Road Titusville New Jersey / US | ||
02 /
Sprague, Peter W. 23 Timberlane Drive Pennington New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104221.3 | 29.04.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | US19820373570 | 30.04.1982 Original published format: US 373570 | [1983/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095584 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095584 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095584 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/12, C07D417/12, C07K5/06, C07F9/65, C07D207/16, A61K31/505, A61K31/53 | [1987/02] | CPC: |
C07D403/12 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D207/16 (EP);
C07D417/12 (EP);
C07F9/65583 (EP);
C07K5/0222 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1983/49] | C07D403/12, C07D417/12, C07C103/52, C07F9/30, C07D207/16, A61K31/505, A61K31/53 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/49] | Title | German: | Substituierte 4-Phenoxy und 4-Phenylthio-Proline | [1983/49] | English: | Substituted 4-phenoxy and 4-phenylthio prolines | [1983/49] | French: | 4-Phénoxy- et 4-phénylthio-prolines substituées | [1983/49] | Examination procedure | 27.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 14.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0000833 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [AD]US4168267 (PETRILLO JR EDWARD W); | [Y]FR2444669 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [A]FR2446281 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [Y]GB2061933 (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | [A]FR2478632 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0036572 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM [DE]); | [A]EP0042639 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [Y]GB2078733 (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | [YD]US4316906 (ONDETTI MIGUEL A, et al); | [P]EP0053902 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) | Examination | - BURGER'S MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, 4th Edition, Part III, 165-170, 174, 175 |