EP0094590 - Plant in which a refrigerant is circulated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.1986 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hopp, Michael Kasemattenstrasse 18 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | 02 /
Möller, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Platanenstrasse 5 D-6095 Bischofsheim / DE | 03 /
Parzefall, Walter Bebelstrasse 72 D-6093 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg 1 / DE | 04 /
Weidenbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Adolf-Reichwein-Weg 12 D-6097 Trebur 3 / DE | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Schaefer, Gerhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | Schaefer, Gerhard, Dr. Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104570.3 | 10.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823219023 | 19.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3219023 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094590 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094590 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
F25B43/006 (EP);
F25B2400/075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Anlage, in der ein Kältemittel im Kreislauf geführt wird | [1983/47] | English: | Plant in which a refrigerant is circulated | [1983/47] | French: | Installation dans laquelle un réfrigérant est circulé | [1983/47] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 13.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/30] | 21.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3754409 ; | [Y]DE630311 ; | [A]US1896061 ; | [A]DE569349 ; | [A]US4291548 ; | [A]CH146359 ; | [A]CH189230 ; | [A]US3938353 ; | [A]US3636723 |