EP0095087 - Three-service wire distributing unit and outlet means therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.1987 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERTSON BAUELEMENTE GmbH Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 27 D-4052 Korschenbroich 1 / DE | [1983/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albrecht, Raymond Eugene 331 Woodland Rd. Edgeworth Sewickley Pennsylvania 15143 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104594.3 | 10.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820376913 | 10.05.1982 Original published format: US 376913 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095087 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/28, H02G3/18 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
H02G3/185 (EP,US);
H02G3/283 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, NL, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | Dreizweck-Leitungsverteilungseinheit und Austrittmittel dafür | [1983/48] | English: | Three-service wire distributing unit and outlet means therefor | [1983/48] | French: | Unité de distribution pour lignes de trois services et moyens d'accès pour celle-ci | [1983/48] | File destroyed: | 28.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 03.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/26] | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1987/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |