EP0094633 - Spiro-2-aza-alkane-3-carbonitriles, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.1989 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.1989 [1989/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teetz, Volker, Dr. An der Tann 20 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | [1983/47] | Application number, filing date | 83104713.9 | 13.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | DE19823218540 | 17.05.1982 Original published format: DE 3218540 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0094633 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0094633 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094633 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/54, // C07C93/12, C07C121/46 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
C07D209/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/47] | Title | German: | Spiro-2-aza-alkan-3-carbonitrile, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung | [1983/47] | English: | Spiro-2-aza-alkane-3-carbonitriles, process for their preparation and their use | [1983/47] | French: | Spiro-2-aza-alcan-3-carbonitriles, leur procédé de préparation et leur application | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/11] | 03.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2756360 (ROHM & HAAS); | [Y]EP0050800 (SCHERING CORP [US]) |