EP0097804 - Stopper for an anchor chain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hermann Sürken GmbH & Co. KG Deverhafen D-2990 Papenburg-Ems / DE | [1984/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weyd, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Baumstrasse 45 D-2870 Delmenhorst / DE | [1984/02] | Representative(s) | Jabbusch, Wolfgang Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Hauptstrasse 85 26131 Oldenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang Jabbusch Arendt & Siekmann Koppelstrasse 3 26135 Oldenburg / DE | ||
Former [1984/02] | Jabbusch, Wolfgang, Dr.Jur. Jabbusch, Wehser & Lauerwald Patentanwälte Koppelstrasse 3 D-26135 Oldenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104767.5 | 14.05.1983 | [1984/02] | Priority number, date | DE19823224167 | 29.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3224167 | [1984/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0097804 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0097804 | Date: | 02.01.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0097804 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/18 | [1984/02] | CPC: |
B63B21/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1984/02] | Title | German: | Ankerkettenstopper | [1984/02] | English: | Stopper for an anchor chain | [1984/02] | French: | Stoppeur pour chaînes d'ancre | [1984/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/30] | 31.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.08.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1126270 (WILLY H SCHLIEKER K G); | [A]FR2176769 (HOWALDTSWERKE DEUTSCHE WERFT [DE]); | [A]DE2552057 (BROEHL GMBH MASCHF); | [A]DE1090130 (DEUTSCHE WERFT AG); | [A]DE2307153 (KOCKUMS MEKANISKA VERKSTADS AB); | [A]US3638599 (NILSEN HAROLD E) |