EP0094665 - Process and equipment for the preparation of a suspension of cyanuric chloride in water or for the conversion of cyanuric chloride with ammonia or amines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/47] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Punzar, Marianne Gustackerstrasse 13/2 CH-4103 Bottmingen / CH | 02 /
Marti, Franz, Dr. Hügelweg 47 CH-4143 Dornach / CH | 03 /
Mercier, Robert Matthäusstrasse 9 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 04 /
Tobler, Paul Gstaltenrainweg 84 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | 05 /
Büttiker, Rudolf, Dr. Arnikastrasse 9 CH-4125 Riehen / CH | [1983/47] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz, et al Zumstein & Klingseisen, Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/47] | Zumstein, Fritz sen., Dr. Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104811.1 | 16.05.1983 | [1983/47] | Priority number, date | CH19820003082 | 18.05.1982 Original published format: CH 308282 | CH19820003184 | 24.05.1982 Original published format: CH 318482 | [1983/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0094665 | Date: | 23.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0094665 | Date: | 01.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0094665 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D251/28, C07D251/44, C07D251/56, C07D251/70, C09B62/085, B01J19/26 | [1983/47] | CPC: |
C07D251/56 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
C07D251/26 (EP,US);
C07D251/44 (EP,US);
C07D251/50 (EP,US);
C07D251/70 (EP,US);
C09B62/085 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00119 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00153 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00162 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00164 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00182 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1983/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zur Herstellung einer Suspension von Cyanurchlorid in Wasser oder zur Umsetzung von Cyanurchlorid mit Ammoniak oder Aminen | [1983/47] | English: | Process and equipment for the preparation of a suspension of cyanuric chloride in water or for the conversion of cyanuric chloride with ammonia or amines | [1983/47] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la préparation d'une suspension de chlorure de cyanuryle dans l'eau ou pour la conversion de chlorure de cyanuryle avec de l'ammoniaque ou des amines | [1983/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/47] | 14.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
14.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.09.1987
14.10.1987
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 08.02.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.06.1988 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.07.1988 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.05.1990 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.05.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 06.12.1990 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2441624 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [X]DE2850271 (DEGUSSA); | [X]DE2850338 (DEGUSSA); | [XD]FR2441620 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [X]US2779763 ; | [A]DE1670731 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE2551164 (DEGUSSA) |