EP0095123 - Sustained release diethylpropion compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walters, Eugene L. 7720 Remington Road Cincinnati Ohio 45242 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit 34 21040 Gerenzano (VA) / IT | [2010/01] |
Former [1986/39] | Sgarbi, Renato Gruppo Lepetit S.p.A. Patent & Trademark Department 34, Via Roberto Lepetit I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1985/17] | Sgarbi, Renato GRUPPO LEPETIT S.p.A. Patent and Trademark Department Via Roberto Lepetit, 34 I-21040 Gerenzano (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1984/32] | De Carli, Elda PATENT DEPARTMENT c/o Gruppo Lepetit S.p.A. Via Durando 38 I-20158 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1983/48] | De Carli, Elda PATENT DEPARTMENT c/o Gruppo Lepetit S.p.A. Via Durando 38 I-20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 83104832.7 | 17.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820379848 | 20.05.1982 Original published format: US 379848 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095123 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095123 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095123 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/26, A61K31/135 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/135 (EP,US);
A61K9/1617 (EP,US);
A61K9/4858 (EP,US);
A61K9/4866 (EP,US);
A61P3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | Diäthylpropionpräparate mit verzögerter Wirkung | [1983/48] | English: | Sustained release diethylpropion compositions | [1983/48] | French: | Compositions du diéthylpropion à libération continue | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/08] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB849755 (TEMMLER WERKE); | [YD]US3001910 (JANDIRK SCHUTTE); | [Y]US3065143 (CHRISTENSON GEORGE L, et al); | [A]US3150043 (VICTOR LAFON); | [A]US3374146 (STANLEY BLICHARZ MITCHELL, et al); | [A]AT264715B (WANDER AG DR A); | [A]US3427378 (HENDERSON NORMAN LEO, et al); | [A]DE2645547 (SQUIBB & SONS INC); | [A]GB1546448 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE) |