EP0095139 - Speech synthesis from prosody data and human sound indicia data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dittakavi, Ashok 5520 58th Street No. 236 Lubbock Texas 79414 / US | 02 /
Lin, Kun-Shan 8601 Utica Avenue Lubbock Texas 79424 / US | 03 /
Fernandez, Jose 5520 58th Street No. 124 Lubbock Texas 79414 / US | 04 /
Foster, Bradley N. 5502 Saratoga Corpus Christi Texas / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Leiser, Gottfried, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | Leiser, Gottfried, Dipl.-Ing., et al Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83104905.1 | 18.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820381986 | 25.05.1982 Original published format: US 381986 | US19820381987 | 25.05.1982 Original published format: US 381987 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095139 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095139 | Date: | 22.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G10L1/10, G09B5/06 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
G10L13/02 (EP);
G09B5/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/48] | Title | German: | Sprachsynthese aus Prosodiedaten und aus Klangdaten menschlicher Sprache | [1983/48] | English: | Speech synthesis from prosody data and human sound indicia data | [1983/48] | French: | Synthèse de parole à partir de données prosodiques et de données caractérisant le son de la voix humaine | [1983/48] | File destroyed: | 07.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/18] | 19.12.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/45] | 09.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.06.1986 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0042155 | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, vol. CE-27, no. 2, May 1981, pages 144-150, New York, USA |