EP0096265 - Electrochemical storage cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/51] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jessen, Jens-Christian Wasserturmstrasse 39 D-6904 Eppelheim / DE | 02 /
Lücke, Hans-Hermann Auweg 8 D-6909 Walldorf / DE | [1983/51] | Representative(s) | Kempe, Wolfgang, et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr., et al c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1983/51] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Brown, Boveri & Cie AG Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105005.9 | 20.05.1983 | [1983/51] | Priority number, date | DE19823220903 | 03.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3220903 | DE19823222525 | 16.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3222525 | [1983/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0096265 | Date: | 21.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0096265 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/34 | [1983/51] | CPC: |
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H01M10/3909 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/51] | Title | German: | Elektrochemische Speicherzelle | [1983/51] | English: | Electrochemical storage cell | [1983/51] | French: | Pile électrochimique rechargeable | [1983/51] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/31] | 29.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.08.1986 | FR | 20.08.1986 | IT | 20.08.1986 | NL | 20.08.1986 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 20.08.1986 | |
IT | 20.08.1986 | ||
NL | 20.08.1986 | ||
Former [1988/34] | BE | 20.08.1986 | |
NL | 20.08.1986 | ||
Former [1988/04] | BE | 20.08.1986 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0013005 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]US4124739 (SUDWORTH JAMES L); | [A]US4011366 (BONES ROGER JOHN, et al); | [A]GB814043 (UNION CARBIDE CORP) |