EP0095173 - Control system and method for a power delivery system having a continuously variable ratio transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/48] | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Andrew A. 1034, Hillside Avenue Madison-city Wisconsin 53705 / US | [1983/48] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/31] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1983/48] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83105061.2 | 20.05.1983 | [1983/48] | Priority number, date | US19820380923 | 21.05.1982 Original published format: US 380923 | [1983/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0095173 | Date: | 30.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0095173 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095173 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60K41/12 | [1983/48] | CPC: |
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/101 (EP,US);
B60W30/1819 (EP,US);
B60W30/1882 (EP,US);
F16H61/66 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/48] | Title | German: | Steuersystem und -verfahren für ein System zur Leistungsabgabe mit einem stufenlosen Getriebe | [1983/48] | English: | Control system and method for a power delivery system having a continuously variable ratio transmission | [1983/48] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'une unité débitant de la puissance avec transmission à variation continue | [1983/48] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1984 | Examination requested [1984/15] | 21.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2744627 (VOLVO CAR BV); | [A]DE2811574 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE2927707 (SUNDSTRAND CORP); | [A]FR2463696 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE]); | [A]FR2464852 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]GB2057600 (PIV ANTRIEB REIMERS KG WERNER); | [A]WO7900781 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) |