EP0095697 - 2,2-Dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclobutanones, a process for their preparation and new 2,2-dimethyl-3-aryl-4-halo-cyclobutanones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/49] | Process for the preparation of 2,2-dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclopropane-carboxylic acids and their esters, intermediate products therefor and processes for their preparation | ||
[1985/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1986 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/49] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lantzsch, Reinhard, Dr. Heymannstrasse 32 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 02 /
Arlt, Dieter, Prof. Dr. Rybnikerstrasse 2 D-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 03 /
Jautelat, Manfred, Dr. Müllersbaum 28 D-5093 Burscheid / DE | [1983/49] | Application number, filing date | 83105090.1 | 24.05.1983 | [1983/49] | Priority number, date | DE19823220730 | 02.06.1982 Original published format: DE 3220730 | [1983/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0095697 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0095697 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07C61/39, C07C61/40, C07C62/34, C07C69/753, C07D333/24, C07D307/54, C07C49/657, C07C49/697, C07D333/22, C07D307/46, C07C51/00 | [1983/49] | CPC: |
C07D307/56 (EP,US);
C07C45/63 (EP,US);
C07C45/65 (EP,US);
C07C45/68 (EP,US);
C07C49/223 (EP,US);
C07C49/657 (EP,US);
C07C49/683 (EP,US);
C07C49/697 (EP,US);
C07C49/753 (EP,US);
C07C51/00 (EP,US);
C07D307/68 (EP,US);
C07D307/70 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/63, C07C49/233 (EP,US);
C07C45/65, C07C49/697 (US,EP);
C07C45/68, C07C49/233 (US,EP);
C07C51/00, C07C61/40 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1983/49] | Title | German: | 2,2-Dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclo-butanone, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie neue 2,2-Dimethyl-3-aryl-4-halogen-cyclobutanone | [1985/47] | English: | 2,2-Dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclobutanones, a process for their preparation and new 2,2-dimethyl-3-aryl-4-halo-cyclobutanones | [1985/47] | French: | 2,2-Diméthyl-3-aryl-cyclobutanones, procédé de leurs préparation et les 2,2-diméthyl-3-aryl-4-halogèno-cyclobutanones nouvelles | [1985/47] |
Former [1983/49] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,2-Dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclo-propancarbonsäuren (carbonsäureestern), neue Zwischenprodukte hierfür und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | ||
Former [1983/49] | Process for the preparation of 2,2-dimethyl-3-aryl-cyclopropane-carboxylic acids and their esters, intermediate products therefor and processes for their preparation | ||
Former [1983/49] | Procédé pour la préparation des acides 2,2-diméthyl-3-aryl-cyclopropane carboxyliques et de leurs esters, produits intermédiaires pour ce procédé et procédés pour leur préparation | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.05.1983 | Examination requested [1983/49] | 01.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.12.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.05.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH589584 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | DE2654062 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2715336 [ ] (BAYER AG); | EP0043492 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]) |